This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 11:55:35 (UTC).

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD. VS. RODRIGUEZ, ALEX

Case Summary

On 03/04/2009 ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD filed an Other lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, ALEX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0820

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD. A PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ ALEX

BEDFORD VILLAS LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT M. BINAM - ROBERT M BINAM ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT M. BINAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/19/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 11/17/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD.) A PARTNERSHIP FOR REJECTION OF COURT JUDGMENT (SEE ATTACHED). 1)THE COURT CANNOT AWARD ANY REMEDY NOT REQUESTED IN THE COMPLAINT; 2)MECHANIC'S LIEN RECORDED 11/21/08; ACTION NOT FILED UNTIL SUBMITTED ON 07/08/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO RESEARCH ATTORNEY RE: COURT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY BOBBI TILLMON . MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO PERFECT REQUEST FOR JUDGMENT. . HEARING ON 09/09/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED AS TO (RODRIGUEZ, ALEX) , THE FIRST AND CAUSES OF ACTION, AND DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE ***ONLY*** .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (BEDFORD VILLAS, LLC.) ON 07/08/09 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 266.25 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (BEDFORD VILLAS, LLC.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (BEDFORD VILLAS, LLC.) SERVED KATE DAVIDSON . COSTS OF $ 66.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH490068001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE BOBBI TILLMON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 07/02/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 03/04/09

    Read MoreRead Less