This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2016 at 08:11:16 (UTC).

ROBERT C. WORTH, INC. VS. AJT CONSTRUCTION CO.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2010 ROBERT C WORTH, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AJT CONSTRUCTION CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are IRA WEINREB, MARK SALTZMAN, JEFFREY M. HARKAVY and ALAN FRIEDENTHAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1679

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

IRA WEINREB

MARK SALTZMAN

JEFFREY M. HARKAVY

ALAN FRIEDENTHAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT C. WORTH INC.

Defendant

AJT CONSTRUCTION CO.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/18/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE VAN NUYS COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM LAS10S01679 TO LAV10SV1679

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NVQ , HON. COMMISSIONER JEFFREY M. HARKAVY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NVR , HON. MARK SALTZMAN PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 01/24/11 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NVR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NVR , HON. IRA WEINREB PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 12/27/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NVR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NVR , HON. ALAN FRIEDENTHAL PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 12/13/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NVR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (AJT CONSTRUCTION CO.) BY SUB-SERVING OFFICE MANAGER, SECRETARU . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/04/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NVR COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAS511000005 . HEARING SET FOR 10/04/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NVR

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBERT C WORTH INC A CALIFORNIA CORP is a litigant