This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2016 at 06:42:40 (UTC).

ROBERT C. WORTH, INC. VS. A. FISKE SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2010 ROBERT C WORTH, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against A FISKE SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALAN H. FRIEDENTHAL and ALAN FRIEDENTHAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1517

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ALAN H. FRIEDENTHAL

ALAN FRIEDENTHAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT C. WORTH INC.

Defendant

A. FISKE SERVICES INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/17/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE VAN NUYS COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM LAS10S01517 TO LAV10SV1517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NVR , HON. ALAN H. FRIEDENTHAL PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NVR , HON. ALAN FRIEDENTHAL PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 10/12/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NVR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NVR , HON. ALAN FRIEDENTHAL PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 10/04/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NVR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (A. FISKE SERVICES, INC.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/20/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NVR . COSTS OF $ 695.80 . CHARGE WAS FOR A SURVEILLANCE SEARCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LA5110000006 . HEARING SET FOR 09/20/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NVR

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBERT C WORTH INC A CALIFORNIA CORP is a litigant