This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/18/2021 at 05:57:38 (UTC).

RIVERWALK HOLDINGS, LTD VS. RIVERA, LISA M

Case Summary

On 09/23/2009 RIVERWALK HOLDINGS, LTD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RIVERA, LISA M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LESLIE E. BROWN and RICHARD A. STONE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3824

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

LESLIE E. BROWN

RICHARD A. STONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVERWALK HOLDINGS LTD

Defendant

RIVERA LISA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES - KAREN K. AFRA

Attorney at MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - CUAUHTEMOC V. MARTIN

AT LAW - CUAUHTEMOC V. MARTIN

Attorney at AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON12/28/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 11:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 , HON. JUDGERICHARD A. STONE PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. NOAPPEARANCE BY OR FOR THE PLAINTIFF COURT ORDERS CASEDISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALLPARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR DEFENDANT(RIVERA, LISA M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT(S) (RIVERA, LISA M)FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER/TRIAL SETTING ORDER SIGNED AND FILEDBY LESLIE E. BROWN . MATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON05/27/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 . . NOTICE OFCOURT TRIAL MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVEPARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO 006 RE: OSC 033010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RESEARCH ATTORNEY RE: COURTJUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2009
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (RIVERA, LISA M) . RECEIPT #BH490068005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE;NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (RIVERA,LISA M) SERVED BARRY RODRIGUEZ . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RNBH490068033.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TODEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE RICHARD A. STONE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNEDAND FILED BY RICHARD A. STONE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONSSHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OFSERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARINGON 03/30/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 006 . CERTIFICATEOF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Riverwalk Holdings Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES - KAREN K. AFRA