This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 08:31:11 (UTC).

REYES, ANTONIO LOERA VS. GARCIA, ARTURO

Case Summary

On 02/23/2009 REYES, ANTONIO LOERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARCIA, ARTURO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0543

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VALENZUELA IRMA

INCHAURREGUI MADELIN

INCHAURREGUI ESTEFANIE

INCHAURREGUI SALVADOR

REYES ANTONIO LOERA

Defendants

GARCIA TIMO

GARCIA ARTURO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LEE ARTER - LEE C. ARTER ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LEE ARTER

Defendant Attorney

EARLY, MASLACH & O'SHEA - ELIZABETH M. CHIDI

Attorney at EARLY, MASLACH & O'SHEA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • MEDIATION STATEMENT OF FULL AGREEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 11/12/09 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR BY SELECTION OF ADR CLERK OF: MARSHALL ADAIR CASKEY ESQ. FILED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MEDIATION MUST BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 10/14/09 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 10/14/09 AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. MED . MEDIATION COMPLETION DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM ORLY S. TALMOR, ESQ. IN THE SUM OF $ 6.50 FOR STIPULATION TO PARTICIPATE IN ADR AND ADR CASE REFERRAL INTAKE VIA FAX FILING . RECEIPT # ELM478900016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM ORLY S. TALMOR IN THE SUM OF $ 3.50 FOR CONFIRMATION VIA FAX FILING . RECEIPT # ELM478900032 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • STIPULATION TO PARTICIPATE IN ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • ADR CASE REFERRAL INTAKE FORM FILED BY (REYES, ANTONIO LOERA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2009
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FOR ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT (GARCIA, TIMO) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. LYNN D. OLSON PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL, CASE IS REFERRED FOR MEDIATION TO BE COMPLETED BY 07/14/09 AND MATTER CONTINUED TO 08/12/09 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN POM115119016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS TRANSFERRED AND RECEIVED FROM POMONA SUPERIOR COURT; COMPLAINT FILED 8-6-08 SUMMONS FILED 8-6-08 GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED 8-6-08 CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND ADDENDUM FILED 8-6-08 NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT FILED 8-7-08 PROOF OF SERVICE FILED 9-2-08 PROOF OF SERVICE FILED 9-2-08 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED 1-6-09 MINUTE ORDER DATED 1-7-09 ANSWER FILED 1-12-09 CROSS COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS ON X-COMP FILED 1-12-09 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED 1-12-09 CASE MANAGEMENT FILED 1-13-09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • THE FOLLOWING ITEMS RECEIVED AND CONTINUE; NOTICE OF RULING FILED 1-21-09 CASE MANAGMENT FILED 1-26-09 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED 2-4-09 DECLARATION FILED 2-5-09 CERTIFIED COPY OF CASE HISTORY CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER (2) RECEIPT FOR RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • NOTICE OF RULING RECEIVED FROM POMONA SUPERIOR COURT FILED 2-9-09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/10/09 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less