This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2016 at 11:26:23 (UTC).

REMMET HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS WESLEY, THERESA

Case Summary

On 12/03/2008 REMMET HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WESLEY, THERESA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5130

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REMMET HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

WESLEY THERESA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNTER, SCOTT ALAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • TOTAL OF ALL POSTJUDGMENT COSTS $1232.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT $ 4174.34 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST $ 3388.94 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS $887.00. ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT $4072.60 +

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $547.00

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2009
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED+

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER - PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • OSC SET 06/08/09, 0830 AM, DEPT. 108, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REMMET HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hunter, Scott A