This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 03:46:39 (UTC).

REMMET HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS MAIS, ALLISON A.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2011 REMMET HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MAIS, ALLISON A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0875

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REMMET HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

MAIS ALLISON A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNTER, SCOTT ALAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2013
  • Docket** CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERMNENT CODE SECTION 68151-68153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2011
  • DocketA/C ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • DocketOSC SET 07/29/11, 0830 AM, DEPT. 108, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REMMET HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hunter, Scott A