Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2016 at 13:16:12 (UTC).

RAPHAEL FAMILY WOOSTER ST CO, LLC. VS YOUNTOBIAN, SHOKOS

Case Summary

On 12/27/2006 RAPHAEL FAMILY WOOSTER ST CO, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against YOUNTOBIAN, SHOKOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1119

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAPHAEL FAMILY WOOSTER ST CO LLC.

Defendant

YOUNTOBIAN SHOKOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SZKOLNIK, FRED M

Defendant Attorney

TACHNER, MARVIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2007
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2007
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2007
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2007
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2007
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2007
  • STIPULATION AND JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2007
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2007
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2007
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2007
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2007
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2007
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2007
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR 01/18/07, 08:30 AM, DEPT 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2007
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2007
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2006
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2006
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SZKOLNIK FRED M.