This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2016 at 07:09:00 (UTC).

RAMONA AND PECK INVESTMENTS, L VS. JIMENEZ, BRIAN

Case Summary

On 02/08/2010 RAMONA AND PECK INVESTMENTS, L filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JIMENEZ, BRIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LIA R. MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0128

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LIA R. MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMONA AND PECK INVESTMENTS LP

Defendants

JIMENEZ ALFA JULIE

JIMENEZ BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF ALLEN K. BROWN - ALLEN K. BROWN ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ALLEN K. BROWN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (RAMONA AND PECK INVESTMENTS, LP) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. PLEASE CORRECT #1 ON PAGE 2. THE COURT WAIVED FEES AND COSTS AS TO BRIAN JIMENEZ ONLY. THANK YOU SUBMITTED ON 05/17/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (RAMONA AND PECK INVESTMENTS, LP) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. PLEASE COMPLETE #1 ON PAGE 2 AND RE-SUBMIT. THANK YOU SUBMITTED ON 05/11/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (RAMONA AND PECK INVESTMENTS, LP) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. PLEASE COMPLETE #2. A WAIVER WAS FILED FOR BRIAN JIMENEZ AND COMPLETE THE DECLARATION CONCERNING WAIVED COURT FEES ON PAGE 2 AND RE-SUBMIT. THANK YOU SUBMITTED ON 04/01/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (RAMONA AND PECK INVESTMENTS, LP) FOR REJECTION OF NOTICE OF RULING. THE NOTICE OF RULING STATES EX PARTE WAS HEARD IN DEPARTMENT 002. PLEASE CORRECT, MOTION WAS HEARD IN DEPARTMENT 001. SUBMITTED ON 04/01/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 103.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: ORDER TO STAYING EXECUTION; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED. FILE SENT TO DEPT. 001 . RECEIPT # ELM511049015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR EX PARTE ORDER RE: TO RECALL AND QUASH WRIT OF EXECUTION AND TO SET ASIDE JUDGEMENT , P & A, AND DECLARATION RE: TWENTY-FOUR HOUR NOTICE FILED. SET FOR 03/29/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 . RECEIPT # ELM511049015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. COMM. LIA R. MARTIN PRESIDING FOR MOTION EXPARTE APPLICATION TO QUASH WRIT OF EXECUTION AND SET ASIDE JUDGMENT : MOTION IS GRANTED. JUDGMENT ENTERED 03/18/10 IS SET ASIDE. WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 03/22/10 IS RECALLED AND QUASHED. MATTER IS RESET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 04/06/10 AT 1:30PM IN DIVISION 001. ...

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (JIMENEZ, BRIAN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY PERSONALLY HAND DELIVERING A TRUE COPY OF THE ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS TO THE APPLICANT(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • ANSWER FILED OF (JIMENEZ, BRIAN) . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • ANSWER FILED OF (JIMENEZ, ALFA JULIE) . RECEIPT # ELM443036049 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • REQUEST(S) TO WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (JIMENEZ, BRIAN) IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY PERSONALLY HAND DELIVERING A TRUE COPY OF THE ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS TO THE APPLICANT(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2010
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM236112015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAMONA & PECK INVESTMENTS, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN ALLEN KENT