This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 21:18:14 (UTC).

RABADI, FARAS VS WORLD GOLD GROUP INC AURUM ADV

Case Summary

On 03/25/2009 RABADI, FARAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WORLD GOLD GROUP INC AURUM ADV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MINA D. FRIED and LEE GRANT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2027

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MINA D. FRIED

LEE GRANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RABADI RAED

RABADI FARAS

Defendant

WORLD GOLD GROUP INC AURUM ADVISORS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY SATISFIED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # LAV528989004 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • CLERK`S NOTICE WRIT FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ , HON. MINA D. FRIED, COMR. PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT. MOTION IS DENIED. JUDGMENT TO STAND. YOU HAVE 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE THE NOTICE WAS MAILED TO FILE AN APPEAL RE: THE DENIAL TO THE MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER NONE .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE ON HEARING RE: MOTION TO VACATE FILED BY (RABADI, FARAS) . MATTER CONTINUED TO 06/14/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ . RECEIPT # LAV481990001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RECEIVED FROM (RABADI, FARAS) . CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. NWZ FOR CONSIDERATION /P1 POSTPONEMENT REQUEST FOR MOTION TO VACATE HEARING . RECEIPT # LAV481990001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/P0STPONEMENT OF (RABADI, FARAS) IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON{S}: # 3 INDICATES A COPY OF THE REQUEST WAS MAILED ON 05/17/10, A DATE WHICH HAS NOT YET OCCURED. REQUEST DENIED FOR INSUFFICIENT PROOF OF SERVICE. . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RECEIVED FROM (RABADI, FARAS) . CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. NWZ FOR CONSIDERATION /P1 POSTPONEMENT REQUEST FOR MOTION TO VACATE HEARING . RECEIPT # LAV522290001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 08/13/09 . FOR (RABADI, FARAS) , (RABADI, RAED) . AGAINST (WORLD GROUP INC) DBA (AURUM ADVISORS) . PRINCIPAL $ 7225.00 . COSTS $ 75.00 . TOTAL $ 7300.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 08/13/09 AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (WORLD GROUP INC) DBA (AURUM ADVISORS) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM NWZ .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (WORLD GROUP INC) DBA (AURUM ADVISORS) BY SUB-SERVING KRIS HOWARD . COSTS OF $ 0.00 . AT THE WINDOW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2009
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 08/13/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2009
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF RESET HEARING FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO PLAINTIFF CLAIM BY SUB-SERVING AN ADULT WHO SEEMS TO BE IN CHARGE . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAV502663005. HEARING SET FOR 06/04/09 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. NWZ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less