This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 12:40:14 (UTC).

QUATTROCH, JOSEPH JR. VS. WACHOVIA SECURITES LLC

Case Summary

On 06/17/2008 QUATTROCH, JOSEPH JR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WACHOVIA SECURITES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JANE GODFREY and JOHN T. RAFFERTY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1070

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JANE GODFREY

JOHN T. RAFFERTY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUATTROCH JOSEPH JR.

Defendants

PRINCIOTTA FRED

WACHOVIA SECURITES LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/21/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • RECEIVED A MOTION TO THE COURT, NOTICE OF JUDICIAL ERROR FROM THE PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO FRED PRINCIOTTA FOR WACHOVIA SECURITIES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. JOHN T. RAFFERTY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING . THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE RE: CORRESPONDENCE RECEIVED FROM DEFENDANT. RECEIVED FROM (QUATTROCH, JOSEPH JR.) AND PLACED INTO CASE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION RECEIVED FROM (WACHOVIA SECURITES LLC) AND PLACED INTO CASE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2008
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE RE: DISMISSAL DUE TO LACK OF JURISDICTION RECEIVED FROM (WACHOVIA SECURITES LLC) AND PLACED INTO CASE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO WACHOVIA .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2008
  • PLAINTIFF REFUSES TO STIPLATE TO THE JUDGE PRO TEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2008
  • MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 02:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. JANE GODFREY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 10/03/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 . VENUE PROPER. PROOF OF SERVICE PROPER AS TO DEFENDANT FRED PRINCIOTTA. DEFENDANT WACHOVIA SECURITIES LLC WAIVES DEFECT IN PROOF OF SERVICE. MATTER CONTINUED TO OCTOBER 3, 2008 AT 1:30 PM IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (PRINCIOTTA, FRED) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/19/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (WACHOVIA SECURITES LLC) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/19/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED 1ST REQUEST FROM COURT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 09/19/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAWPAID. HEARING SET FOR 08/01/08 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 092.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.