This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 14:52:31 (UTC).

QUALLS, CHRIS VS. OPPERMAN, DWIGHT

Case Summary

On 10/10/2008 QUALLS, CHRIS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OPPERMAN, DWIGHT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN T. RAFFERTY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1872

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN T. RAFFERTY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUALLS CHRIS DBA PRIDE POOL SERVICE

Defendant

OPPERMAN DWIGHT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/01/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO MITRA AHOURAIAN FOR DWIGHT OPPERMAN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 0.50 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # LAW539373004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. JOHN T. RAFFERTY PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT. MOTION GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. JOHN T. RAFFERTY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING . THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 0.50 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # LAW539373004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND DECLARATION FILED BY (OPPERMAN, DWIGHT) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/10/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO ALL PARTIES. RECEIPT # LAW507985002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • DECLARATION OF DWIGHT OPPERMAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO CHRIS QUALLS FOR QUALLS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. JOHN T. RAFFERTY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/09/09 . FOR (QUALLS, CHRIS) DBA (PRIDE POOL SERVICE ) . AGAINST (OPPERMAN, DWIGHT) . PRINCIPAL $ 681.68 . COSTS $ 65.00 . TOTAL $ 746.68 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (OPPERMAN, DWIGHT) BY SUB-SERVING BETTY . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/09/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 02/09/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAWPAID . HEARING SET FOR 12/15/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (QUALLS, CHRIS) DBA (PRIDE POOL SERVICE ) FOR REJECTION OF FICTICIOUS BUSINESS NAME STATMENT: WHEN FILING A DOCUMENT IT MUST HAVE A DATE, PRINTED NAME, AND SIGNATURE. PLEASE COMPLETE AND RETURN. THIS DOCUMENT MUST BE ON FILE WITH THE COURT BEFORE YOUR HEARING DATE. SUBMITTED ON 10/10/08

    Read MoreRead Less