This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 14:25:33 (UTC).

PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES VS. PLATA, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 10/23/2008 PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PLATA, RICHARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1465

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Clarita Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES

Defendants

GONZALEZ ELENA

PLATA RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIMM & SCHOLNICK - ROBERT M. SCHOLNICK

Attorney at GRIMM & SCHOLNICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/01/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 11/24/08 , FOR (PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES) , AGAINST (PLATA, RICHARD) , (GONZALEZ, ELENA) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 24555 TOWN CENTER DR., # 4303, VALENCIA, CA 91355 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED AND MAILED TO PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (PLATA, RICHARD) , (GONZALEZ, ELENA) , ALL OCCUPANTS . COSTS OF $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (PLATA, RICHARD) , (GONZALEZ, ELENA) , ALL OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW253967030.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less