This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2022 at 07:38:49 (UTC).

PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSUL VS. MATEOS, ANA

Case Summary

On 07/01/2010 PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSUL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MATEOS, ANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAIME R. CORRAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1571

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAIME R. CORRAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS

Defendant

MATEOS ANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SCOTT D. WU - SCOTT D. WU

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SCOTT D. WU

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON04/04/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2010
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION ASTO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING IS VACATED, RESPONSIVEPLEADING HAVING BEEN FILED, CASE REMAINS ON CALENDAR FORA NON-APPERANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW ON 11/16/10 AT08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (MATEOS, ANA) . RECEIPT # HPK478659017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ANA MATEOS RE; IDENTITY FRAUD FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASEMANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADRPACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (MATEOS, ANA) . COSTS OF $39.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RNHPK478659009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNEDAND FILED BY JAIME R. CORRAL TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONSSHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OFSERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARINGON 11/16/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 002 . CERTIFICATEOF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TODEPT. 002 OF HONORABLE JAIME R. CORRAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • DocketDECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WU SCOTT D.