This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2016 at 08:53:23 (UTC).

POURSALEH-ETTEHADIEH, MONA VS. KOHANSEDGH, PEJMAN

Case Summary

On 10/07/2009 POURSALEH-ETTEHADIEH, MONA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KOHANSEDGH, PEJMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2002

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POURSALEH-ETTEHADIEH MONA

Defendant

KOHANSEDGH PEJMAN DBA PCS CONSTRUCTION AND REMODELING

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/01/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEST LOS ANGELES COURTHOUSE CLERK'S OFFICE RE: FILE STORAGE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2010
  • PURSUANT TO THE ORDER OF THE COURT, THE APPEAL IS DISMISSED, AND THE CASE IS DISMISSED WITH OUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL AND TRIAL DE NOVO, ON THE MOTION OF (POURSALEH-ETTEHADIEH, MONA) , THE COURT VACATES THE LOWER COURT'S SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT AND FURTHER ORDERS THE FOLLOWING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 1.00 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # LAW539373001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED BY (POURSALEH-ETTEHADIEH, MONA) . RECEIPT NUMBER LAW507985001 . CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/11/10 , AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WES OF THE SUPERIOR COURT - SANTA MONICA BRANCH . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 11/20/09 . FOR (POURSALEH-ETTEHADIEH, MONA) . AGAINST (KOHANSEDGH, PEJMAN) DBA (PCS CONSTRUCTION AND REMODELING) . PRINCIPAL $ 7500.00 . COSTS $ 95.00 . TOTAL $ 7595.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO (POURSALEH-ETTEHADIEH, MONA) . ON DEFENDANT'S CLAIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY (KOHANSEDGH, PEJMAN) DBA (PCS CONSTRUCTION AND REMODELING) IN THE SUM OF $ 7500.00 , BECAUSE THE OWNER LOCKED UP ALL DOORS AND REFUSED ANY ACCESS FOR INSPECTOR TO INSPECT JOB ABD FOR CONTRACTOR TO DO THE REPAIR . RECEIPT # LAW507985003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (KOHANSEDGH, PEJMAN) DBA (PCS CONSTRUCTION AND REMODELING) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/20/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1091007E3499. HEARING SET FOR 11/20/09 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 092.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (KOHANSEDGH, PEJMAN) DBA (PCS CONSTRUCTION AND REMODELING)

    Read MoreRead Less