This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2016 at 11:57:19 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS HERNANDEZ, GUILLERMO

Case Summary

On 05/27/2011 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERNANDEZ, GUILLERMO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9528

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendants

HERNANDEZ GUILLERMO

BARRY MASON ENTERPRISES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & ENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketFULL ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • DocketDEFAULT RETURNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2011
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • DocketDECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MAILING FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2011
  • DocketOSC SET 11/28/11, 0830 AM, DEPT. 77, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less