This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2016 at 21:00:10 (UTC).

PINNACLE CREDIT SERVICES VS. DAVIS, AMY

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 PINNACLE CREDIT SERVICES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAVIS, AMY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3817

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINNACLE CREDIT SERVICES LLC

Defendant

DAVIS AMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP,P.C. - ERICA L. BRACHFELD

Attorney at THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP,P.C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/21/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 04/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE NORWALK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM COM08C03817 TO NOR08CC3817

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY WILLIAM R. CHIDSEY, JR. TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE SET FOR 02/25/09 IS HEREBY VACATED MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 08/17/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 00N . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED /GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY WILLIAM R. CHIDSEY, JR. TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE SET FOR 02/25/09 IS HEREBY VACATED MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 08/17/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 00N . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED /GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (DAVIS, AMY) . COSTS OF $ 56.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN COM525945051.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY SHARON LEWIS MILLER, COMMISSIONER TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/25/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 00N . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.