Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2016 at 09:42:41 (UTC).

PINAULT, RUTH VS. STAFFORD, ANDREW

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 PINAULT, RUTH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against STAFFORD, ANDREW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRUCE E. MITCHELL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0871

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRUCE E. MITCHELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINAULT RUTH

Defendant

STAFFORD ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAKARI LAW, APC - RAYMOND ZAKARI

Attorney at ZAKARI LAW, APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE PASADENA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM ALH11U00871 TO PAS11UV0871

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # ALH256899024 . WRIT RETURNED BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 96.66 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. BRUCE E. MITCHELL, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY RAYMOND ZAKARI . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING IN PRO PER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION ORDERED ENTERED .

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2011
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT: ANSWER FILED ON 11/02/2011 BY DEFENDANT PREVENTS ENTRY OF DEFAULT. SUBMITTED ON 11/08/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • ANSWER FILED OF (STAFFORD, ANDREW) . RECEIPT # WAIVED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (STAFFORD, ANDREW) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (STAFFORD, ANDREW) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE COMPLETED BY HAND DELIVERING A COPY OF THE ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER TO THE APPLICANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ALH512202003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less