This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 10:05:37 (UTC).

PETERS, BLANCHE B. VS. VENEY, KVAUN LEE SANCHULO

Case Summary

On 10/24/2006 PETERS, BLANCHE B filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VENEY, KVAUN LEE SANCHULO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LINDA A. IANNELLI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2443

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LINDA A. IANNELLI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SCHADE DONNA

PETERS BLANCHE B.

Defendant

VENEY KVAUN LEE SANCHULO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - ROGER SHAFER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/12/2013

* EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2013

* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE LONG BEACH COURTHOUSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2013

* CASE RENUMBERED FROM LC 06C02443 TO LB 06UF2443

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2007

REJECT SHEET SENT TO (PETERS, BLANCHE B.) FOR REJECTION OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY THERE IS ONE ON FILE FOR 112806 SUBMITTED ON 01/24/07

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2007

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # PD/2163 .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2006

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2006

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR PLAINTIFF (PETERS, BLANCHE B.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2006

CAUSE CALLED AT 09:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. LINDA A. IANNELLI, PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY RENEE S. SHAFER . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING IN PRO PER .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2006

JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 11/28/06 , FOR (PETERS, BLANCHE B.) , (SCHADE, DONNA) , AGAINST (VENEY, KVAUN LEE SANCHULO) , PAST DUE RENT + DAILY DAMAGES $ 3700.00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ .00 , COSTS $ .00 . TOTAL $ 3,700.00 , AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 9637 BELMONT STREET APT #A, BELLFLOWER, CA 90706 , AND THIS JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46. NO FINAL LOCKOUT PRIOR TO 12-04-06.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2006

MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 11/28/06 AT 09:30A M., IN DIV. 001 .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2006

REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2006

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2006

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2006

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (VENEY, KVAUN LEE SANCHULO) . COSTS OF $ 80.00 .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2006

ANSWER FILED OF (VENEY, KVAUN LEE SANCHULO) PRO PER . RECEIPT # PD .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2006

NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2006

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PD.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2006

SUMMONS ISSUED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2006

SUMMONS FILED .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less