This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2016 at 08:35:24 (UTC).

PERSONAL STORAGE VS. SIBBETT, ALBERT

Case Summary

On 02/28/2007 PERSONAL STORAGE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SIBBETT, ALBERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0254

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERSONAL STORAGE

Defendant

SIBBETT ALBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/05/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2007
  • PURSUANT TO 581 C.C.P , THE COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ORDER OF DISMISSAL SIGNED AND FILED; COPY MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2007
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2007
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2007
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO SMALL CLAIMS DESK RE: 04-16-07 CALENDAR .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2007
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN POM448028009. HEARING SET FOR 04/16/07 AT 09:00 AM IN DIV. 005.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2007
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERSONAL STORAGE is a litigant