This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2016 at 06:22:37 (UTC).

PEREZ, JULIA M VS. SANCHEZ, EDWIN ERNESTO

Case Summary

On 10/09/2009 PEREZ, JULIA M filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SANCHEZ, EDWIN ERNESTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAIME R. CORRAL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1360

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAIME R. CORRAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ JULIA M

Defendants

SANCHEZ EDWIN ERNESTO

HERNANDEZ GRISELDA V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - ROGER S. SHAFER ESQ

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/07/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. JAIME R. CORRAL PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR THE PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2009
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED. AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. JAIME R. CORRAL PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT. COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: DEMURRER SUSTAINED. THE COURT GRANTS THE PLAINTIFF 10 DAYS LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE ANY AND ALL PAPERS/DOCUMENTS NECESSARY TO BRING THE MATTER TO TRIAL OR TO EFFECT A FINAL DISPOSITION AS TO ALL ISSUES AND PARTIES TO THE ACTION. ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY JAIME R. CORRAL . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/23/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2009
  • OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY (PEREZ, JULIA M) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • REQUEST TO OR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (SANCHEZ, EDWIN ERNESTO) , (HERNANDEZ, GRISELDA V.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • REQUEST(S) TO WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (SANCHEZ, EDWIN ERNESTO) , (HERNANDEZ, GRISELDA V.) IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND P & A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY (SANCHEZ, EDWIN ERNESTO) , (HERNANDEZ, GRISELDA V.) . MATTER NOTICED FOR HEARING ON 11/20/09 AT 08:30A M IN DEPT. 002 . RECEIPT # GC68634E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN HPK542830009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 11/23/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAFER ROGER STUART