This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2016 at 06:39:22 (UTC).

PENSIA, LLC VS. SIBONI, ZERI

Case Summary

On 04/20/2011 PENSIA, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SIBONI, ZERI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLIE E. BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0355

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LESLIE E. BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENSIA LLC

Defendant

SIBONI ZERI AKA SIBONI ZARI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDELBAUM & ROBISON LLP - WILLIAM C. ROBISON ESQ

Attorney at MANDELBAUM & ROBISON LLP

Defendant Attorney

BASTA, INC. - SARAH SHIPITSYNA

Attorney at BASTA, INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2016
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO SANTA MONICA COURTHOUSE FROM BEVERLY HILLS COURTHOUSE RE: FILE REQUEST FROM SANTA MONICA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE SANTA MONICA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 11U00355 TO SM 11UB0355

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 1360.00 FILED BY (SIBONI, ZERI) AKA (SIBONI, ZARI) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 16.30 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # BH023536011 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2011
  • ANSWER FILED OF (SIBONI, ZERI) AKA (SIBONI, ZARI) . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2011
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (SIBONI, ZERI) AKA (SIBONI, ZARI) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • ORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED AND FILED. BY JUDGE LESLIE E. BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION AND ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING FOR (SIBONI, ZERI) AKA (SIBONI, ZARI) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 006 FOR CONSIDERATION. RECEIPT # BH451225009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH451225021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE LESLIE E. BROWN .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIPITSYNA, SARAH