This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2016 at 23:46:22 (UTC).

PC MALL, INC. VS. KENSINGTON LABORATORIES, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/08/2010 PC MALL, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KENSINGTON LABORATORIES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1287

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PC MALL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendant

KENSINGTON LABORATORIES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALEN & DAVIS LLP - GLENN D. DAVIS ESQ

Attorney at GALEN & DAVIS LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2010
  • CASE FILE STORED IN BOX #676 SET FOR DESTRUCTION ON 08/19/11 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. DES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (KENSINGTON LABORATORIES, LLC), A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT.... RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO (KENSINGTON LABORATORIES, LLC), A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FILED. COSTS OF $ 59.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SBA470298005.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 09/14/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 100 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 04/08/10

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MALL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS GLENN DARRYL