This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2016 at 07:50:10 (UTC).

PAXTON, KYMBERLY VS. NGUYEN, HAI THANH

Case Summary

On 08/27/2009 PAXTON, KYMBERLY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NGUYEN, HAI THANH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS M. HAIGH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4115

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DOUGLAS M. HAIGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAXTON KYMBERLY

Defendants

NGUYEN HAI THANH

AMTECOL INC

DANG HOA

RUHLANDER STEPHEN

U.S. AUTOMOTIVE SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS & KINGSTON - PAUL KINGSTON

Attorney at ELLIS & KINGSTON

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JAMIE SKEBBA - MICHELLE Y DIXON ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JAMIE SKEBBA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 04/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM LB 09C04115 TO LAM09CL4115

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/21/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SOG , HON. COMMISSIONER DOUGLAS M. HAIGH PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE PROOF OF SERVICE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: ANSWER FILED. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (PAXTON, KYMBERLY) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (NGUYEN, HAI THANH) , (U.S. AUTOMOTIVE SERVICES LLC) , (AMTECOL, INC) , (DANG, HOA) . RECEIPT # FPS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (NGUYEN, HAI THANH) , (U.S. AUTOMOTIVE SERVICES LLC) , (AMTECOL, INC) , (DANG, HOA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN FPS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. SOG OF HONORABLE COMMISSIONER DOUGLAS M. HAIGH .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE ANY AND ALL PAPERS/DOCUMENTS NECESSARY TO BRING THE MATTER TO TRIAL OR TO EFFECT A FINAL DISPOSITION AS TO ALL ISSUES AND PARTIES TO THE ACTION. ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY COMMISSIONER DOUGLAS M. HAIGH . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/10/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SOG . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 01/25/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SOG . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/27/09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DANG HOA LE is a litigant

Latest cases where AMTECOL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KINGSTON, PAUL