This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2016 at 08:55:47 (UTC).

PASADENA GARDENING & TREE SERV VS DELPHIN, DENISE

Case Summary

On 07/02/2009 PASADENA GARDENING TREE SERV filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DELPHIN, DENISE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIE ESPOSITO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0909

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JULIE ESPOSITO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PASADENA GARDENING & TREE SERVICE SINGLE OWNER BUSINESS

Defendants

DELPHIN DENISE

DELPHIN CHRIS J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE ALHAMBRA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM PAS09S00909 TO ALH09SP0909

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 02:10P M, IN DEPT. 007 , HON. JULIE ESPOSITO PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING PASADENA GARDENING AND TREE SERVICE BY JOHN LAMPASONA . DEFENDANT APPEARING JANYSE TOWNSEND .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (DELPHIN, DENISE) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/29/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 007 . COSTS OF $30.00. BY SUB-SERVING CHRIS DELPHIN, BOYFRIEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 09/29/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (DELPHIN, DENISE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (DELPHIN, CHRIS J) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1090707E4943. HEARING SET FOR 08/17/09 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (DELPHIN, CHRIS J) (DELPHIN, DENISE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PASADENA GARDENING & TREE SERVICE SINGLE OWNER BUSINESS is a litigant