This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2016 at 07:46:11 (UTC).

PASADENA GARDENING & TREE SERV VS AYALDE, GABRIEL

Case Summary

On 06/28/2010 PASADENA GARDENING TREE SERV filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AYALDE, GABRIEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELISE RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0853

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELISE RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PASADENA GARDENING & TREE SERVICE SINGLE OWNER BUSINESS

Defendant

AYALDE GABRIEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2015
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO ALHAMBRA RE: RE ASSIGNMENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE ALHAMBRA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM PAS10S00853 TO ALH10SP0853

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • DECLARATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR REGARDING SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (C.C.P. 116.850{C}) FILED BY (AYALDE, GABRIEL) . CLERK'S NOTATION OF ENTRY OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 10/05/12 AS A FULL SATISFACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 08/03/10 . FOR (PASADENA GARDENING & TREE SERVICE) SINGLE OWNER BUSINESS . AGAINST (AYALDE, GABRIEL) . PRINCIPAL $ 100.00 . COSTS $ 0.00 . TOTAL $ 100.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 007 , HON. ELISE RICHARDSON PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING JOHN LAMPASONA . DEFENDANT APPEARING GABRIEL AYALDE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS COOURT FINDS FOR THE PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT TO PAY PLAINTIFF PRINCIPAL IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00 AND NO COURT COSTS. :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (AYALDE, GABRIEL) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/03/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1100628E3180. HEARING SET FOR 08/03/10 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (AYALDE, GABRIEL)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PASADENA GARDENING & TREE SERVICE SINGLE OWNER BUSINESS is a litigant