This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2016 at 10:19:18 (UTC).

PARTRIDGE, NICOLE D. VS. HOUSTON, WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 02/03/2006 PARTRIDGE, NICOLE D filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HOUSTON, WILLIAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are H. JAY FORD and TERRY ADAMSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0015

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

H. JAY FORD

TERRY ADAMSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARTRIDGE NICOLE D.

Defendant

HOUSTON WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JOSEPH H. MARMAN - JOSEPH H. MARMAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JOSEPH H. MARMAN

Defendant Attorney

SILVA A. CLASEN & RAFFALOW - YVONNE BIRCH ESQ

Attorney at SILVA A. CLASEN & RAFFALOW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2008
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 07/09/08 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2007
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (PARTRIDGE, NICOLE D.) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BECAUSE IT IS NOT FULLY FILLED OUT. #5 OR #6 HAS TO BE CHECKED. IF IT IS # IT HAS TO BE WRITTEN OUT. SUBMITTED ON 08/07/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2007
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2007
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION 001 FOR CONSIDERATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2007
  • NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (HOUSTON, WILLIAM) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2007
  • MOTION IN LIMINE RE: FOR AN ORDER EXCLUDING AT TRIAL EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED DURING DISCOVERY FILED BY (HOUSTON, WILLIAM) . RECEIPT # N/A .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2007
  • MOTION IN LIMINE RE: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF INSURANCE FILED BY (HOUSTON, WILLIAM) . RECEIPT # N/A .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2007
  • MOTION IN LIMINE RE: TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES FROM COURTROOM DURING THE TESTIMONY OF OTHER WITNESSES FILED BY (HOUSTON, WILLIAM) . RECEIPT # N/A .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2007
  • MOTION IN LIMINE RE: TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM REFERRING TO BILLS, RECORDS, OR INVOICES WITHOUT PROPER FOUNDATION FILED BY (HOUSTON, WILLIAM) . RECEIPT # N/A .

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (HOUSTON, WILLIAM) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (PARTRIDGE, NICOLE D.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2006
  • ANSWER FILED OF (HOUSTON, WILLIAM) . RECEIPT # MAL510618014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2006
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (HOUSTON, WILLIAM) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; STATEMENT OF DAMAGES; NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (HOUSTON, WILLIAM) . COSTS OF $ 70.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2006
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 05/31/06 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 003 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 02/06/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2006
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2006
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL510618014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less