Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 00:12:31 (UTC).

PARK, HYE KYOUNG CLAIRE VS HS WEDDING GROUP INC

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 PARK, HYE KYOUNG CLAIRE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HS WEDDING GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9796

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PARK JI KWAN

PARK HYE KYOUNG CLAIRE

Defendant

HS WEDDING GROUP INC DBA WEDDING TIME

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2014
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2012
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST IN OPEN COURT. MATTER IS SETTLED. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2012
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (HS WEDDING GROUP INC) DBA (WEDDING TIME) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/06/12 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPARTMENT 090 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (HS WEDDING GROUP INC) DBA (WEDDING TIME) . RETURN TO SENDER UNCLAIMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 01/06/12 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • NOTICE OF CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (HS WEDDING GROUP INC) DBA (WEDDING TIME) . RECEIPT # LAC205564006 . 70101670000204184250

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC205564006. HEARING SET FOR 12/07/11 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less