This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2016 at 21:07:55 (UTC).

OSTERKAMP, BRITT VS COOPER, DALE

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 OSTERKAMP, BRITT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COOPER, DALE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0660

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSTERKAMP BRITT

Defendant

COOPER DALE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2014
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO G C 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2008
  • A/C - ORDER OF DISMISSAL JDGMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2008
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2008
  • CASE DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2008
  • A/C - ORDER OF DISMISSAL JDGMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2008
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 10/01/08 AT 08:30 A M IN DEPT. 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2008
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY DALE COOPER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 09/19/08, 08:30 AM, DEPT 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2008
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2008
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2008
  • A/C - ANSWER FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.