This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2016 at 06:05:04 (UTC).

ORTEGA, ROSA ADILIA VS. GAYTAN, RAMON

Case Summary

On 08/02/2010 ORTEGA, ROSA ADILIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GAYTAN, RAMON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAIME R. CORRAL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1739

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAIME R. CORRAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ORTEGA ROSA ADILIA

ARGUELLO ROBERTO CARLOS

Defendants

SYNERMED

GAYTAN RAMON JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABRIEL & ASSOCIATES - STEVAN COLIN

Attorney at GABRIEL & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

MARK R. WEINER & ASSOCIATES - GINA M. WEIHERT

Attorney at MARK R. WEINER & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 10/12/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2011
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2011
  • DocketMEDIATION STATEMENT OF FULL AGREEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW *SHERIFF'S DEPT SERVED* FILED. SERVED AS TO (SYNERMED) . COSTS OF $ 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED INSERTING IN PLACE AND STEAD OF FICTITIOUS NAME DOE 1 THE TRUE NAME OF (SYNERMED) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR BY SELECTION OF ADR CLERK OF: TERRI N. LUBAROFF ESQ. FILED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MEDIATION MUST BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 06/13/11 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • DocketTHE FOLLOWING DOCUMENT(S) STIPULATION TO PARTICIPATE IN ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION, ADR CASE REFERRAL INTAKE, ADR DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEETS, NOTICE OF REFERRAL AND COPY OF MINUTE ORDER HAS BEEN FORWARDED TO THE ADR OFFICE LOCATED AT: NORWALK SUPERIOR COURT VIA COUNTY MESSENGER .

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2011
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY JAIME R. CORRAL . MATTER IS REFERRED TO MEDIATION . POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS SET FOR 07/11/11 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (ORTEGA, ROSA ADILIA) , (ARGUELLO, ROBERTO CARLOS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (GAYTAN, RAMON),JR. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (GAYTAN, RAMON),JR. . RECEIPT # HPK478659003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED. SERVED AS TO (GAYTAN, RAMON),JR. . COSTS OF $ 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN HPK478659015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • DocketNON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 01/10/11 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/03/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. CLK OF HONORABLE JAIME R. CORRAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SYNERMED INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEIHERT, GINA M