This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2016 at 13:45:50 (UTC).

ORNELAS, MARIA MAGDALENA VS. VARGAS, MARIA DEL CARMEN

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 ORNELAS, MARIA MAGDALENA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VARGAS, MARIA DEL CARMEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT HARRISON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9065

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT HARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORNELAS MARIA MAGDALENA

Defendant

VARGAS MARIA DEL CARMEN AKA GLORIA VARGAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. ROBERT HARRISON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. ROBERT HARRISON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 11/18/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 092 . CONTINUED FOR DEFENDANT TO PAY $520.00 TO PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (VARGAS, MARIA DEL CARMEN) AKA (GLORIA VARGAS) , AND SERVED AS TO (VARGAS, MARIA DEL CARMEN) AKA (GLORIA VARGAS) BY SUB-SERVING JUANA LOPEZ, CASHIER . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/07/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 092 . COSTS OF $ 30.00 . FEE WAIVER GC68511.3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • AMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF TO ADD AKA FILED ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 10/07/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN FEE WAIVER. HEARING SET FOR 09/26/08 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 092.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 092 OF HONORABLE ROBERT HARRISON, COMMISSIONER . .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (ORNELAS, MARIA MAGDALENA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (ORNELAS, MARIA MAGDALENA) IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985{I}, CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • ADMINISTRATIVE FEE OF $21.00 DUE ON WAIVED FEES PURSUANT TO 68511.3(D).

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.