This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2016 at 12:04:41 (UTC).

ONIFADE, KUNLE VS. ELYSIAN CARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/04/2010 ONIFADE, KUNLE filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against ELYSIAN CARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3941

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LABOR COMMISSIONER STATE OF CALIFORNIA

ONIFADE KUNLE

Defendant

ELYSIAN CARE CORPORATION DBA LAWNDALE CARE CENTER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM SBA10C03941 TO LAM10CT3941

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CLERK OFFICE RE: PAYMENT OF $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY KUNLE ONIFADE ASSIGNEE LABOR COMMISSIONER , STATE OF CALIFORNIA AS TO ELYSIAN CARE CORP., A LAWNDALE CARE CENTER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • ORDER AWARD OR DECISION OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED. RECEIPT # SBA071156024 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FINAL ORDER, DECISION, OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 10/04/10 . FOR (ONIFADE, KUNLE) . AGAINST (ELYSIAN CARE CORPORATION), DBA (LAWNDALE CARE CENTER) . PRINCIPAL $ 4831.24 . ATTORNEY FEES $ .00 . INTEREST $ 4.76 . COSTS $ 205.00 . TOTAL $ 5,041.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELYSIAN CARE CORPORATION is a litigant