This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2018 at 15:47:50 (UTC).

NOVAMED SURGERY CENTER OF WHIT VS PARRA, MARY ANN

Case Summary

On 06/22/2010 NOVAMED SURGERY CENTER OF WHIT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PARRA, MARY ANN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARMANDO V. MORENO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0627

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARMANDO V. MORENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOVAMED SURGERY CENTER OF WHITTIER DBA CENTER FOR OUTPATIENT SURGERY

Defendant

PARRA MARY ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE DOWNEY COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM WH 10S00627 TO DOW10SW0627

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (PARRA, MARY ANN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2010
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2010
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 08/04/10 . FOR (NOVAMED SURGERY CENTER OF WHITTIER) DBA (CENTER FOR OUTPATIENT SURGERY) . AGAINST (PARRA, MARY ANN) . PRINCIPAL $ 661.68 . COSTS $ 71.90 . TOTAL $ 733.58 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM 006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2010
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (NOVAMED SURGERY CENTER OF WHITTIER) DBA (CENTER FOR OUTPATIENT SURGERY) , PLAINTIFF SIGNED MARCIA DURAN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 006 , HON. ARMANDO V. MORENO, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY MARCIA DURAN . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT . COURT FINDS THAT THE DEFENDANT(S) IS/ARE NOTIFIED TO APPEAR AS REQUIRED BY LAW. TRIAL PROCEEDS. JUDGMENT IS RENDERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO MARY ANN PARRA . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/04/10 AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 . COSTS OF $ 41.90 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN WH0136797001. HEARING SET FOR 08/04/10 AT 09:30 AM IN DPT. 006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO DEMEYA BREWER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOVAMED SURGERY CENTER OF WHITTIER DBA CENTER FOR OUTPATIENT SURGERY is a litigant