This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 15:10:43 (UTC).

NORTHGLEN CAPITAL VS. VALDEZ, RAUL

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 NORTHGLEN CAPITAL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VALDEZ, RAUL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1589

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHGLEN CAPITAL LLC

Defendants

VALDEZ PATRICIA

VALDEZ RAUL

VALDEZ FRANCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SAM CHANDRA, APC - SAM CHANDRA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SAM CHANDRA, APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2016
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 04/18/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE PASADENA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM CIT08U01589 TO PAS08UJ1589

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 09/16/08 , FOR (NORTHGLEN CAPITAL), LLC , AGAINST (VALDEZ, RAUL) , (VALDEZ, PATRICIA) , (VALDEZ, FRANCO) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 2276 BOLANOS AVE, ROWLANDS HTS, CA 91748 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 96.67 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ATTY SVC . RECEIPT # CIT446486003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED INSERTING IN PLACE AND STEAD OF FICTITIOUS NAME DOE 1 THE TRUE NAME OF FRANCO VALDEZ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (VALDEZ, RAUL) SUBSERVED: FRANCO VALDEZ, OCCUPANT . COSTS OF $ 69.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2008
  • DECLARATION RE: DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (VALDEZ, FRANCO) . COSTS OF $ 69.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (VALDEZ, RAUL) , (VALDEZ, PATRICIA) , (VALDEZ, FRANCO) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS ON 09/12/08 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE ANY AND ALL PAPERS/DOCUMENTS NECESSARY TO BRING THE MATTER TO TRIAL OR TO EFFECT A FINAL DISPOSITION AS TO ALL ISSUES AND PARTIES TO THE ACTION. ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY JACOB ADAJIAN . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/20/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 002 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAID.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.