Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2016 at 05:38:33 (UTC).

NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQUISITION VS. VACA, JOY E.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2009 NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQUISITION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VACA, JOY E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LYNN D. OLSON and LIA R. MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1839

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

Presiding Judge

LIA R. MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQUISITION LLC

Defendant

VACA JOY E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES, INC. - MARK D. WALSH

Attorney at LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES, INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQUISITION LLC) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -COURT ORDERED CASE DISMISSED ON 06-14-10 SUBMITTED ON 02/27/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. COMM. LIA R. MARTIN PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY COMM. LIA R. MARTIN TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE SET FOR 12/22/09 IS HEREBY VACATED MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 06/14/10 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET/ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION;ADR PACKET;NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (VACA, JOY E.) . COSTS OF $ 67.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • SERVICE RE: SUMMONS;COMPLAINT;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET;ADDENDUM STATEMENT OF LOCATION;ADR PACKET;NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO (VACA, JOY E.) FILED. COSTS OF $ 69.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN ELM478900003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/22/09 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQUISITION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES INC. - MARK D. WALSH