This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 07:27:40 (UTC).

NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQUISITION VS. CARDENAS, JOSE A.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2009 NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQUISITION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARDENAS, JOSE A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LYNN D. OLSON and LIA R. MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0470

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

Presiding Judge

LIA R. MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQUISITION

Defendant

CARDENAS JOSE A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE LAW GROUP, A PROF LAW CORPORATION - HARLAN M. REESE

Attorney at REESE LAW GROUP, A PROF LAW CORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. COMM. LIA R. MARTIN PRESIDING FOR MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT : MOTION IS GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND OF NONAPPEARANCE , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # ELM333333012 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/25/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND OF NONAPPEARANCE FILED BY (NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQUISITION) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • DECLARATION RE: OF HARLAN M REESE ESQ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2009
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE SET FOR 08/31/09 IS HEREBY VACATED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 02/16/10 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (CARDENAS, JOSE A.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (NORTH STAR CAPITAL ACQUISITION) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMON & COMPLAINT;VERIFICATION;VENUE;ADDENDUM;CIVIL COVER SHEET;ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CARDENAS, JOSE A.) . COSTS OF $ 39.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN ELM482668020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/31/09 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.