This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2016 at 03:50:25 (UTC).

NORDSTROM NATIONAL CREDIT BANK VS. ROSENGREN, LISA-JAYNE

Case Summary

On 01/28/2009 NORDSTROM NATIONAL CREDIT BANK filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ROSENGREN, LISA-JAYNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0016

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORDSTROM NATIONAL CREDIT BANK

Defendant

ROSENGREN LISA-JAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CIR LAW OFFICES - CHRISTOPHER A. BEYER

Attorney at CIR LAW OFFICES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/27/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 15.00 FOR CERTIFIED COPIES. RECEIPT # MAL047230001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 1.00 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # MAL047230001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT FILED. CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. 001 FOR CONSIDERATION. RECEIPT # MAL047230001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • CASE RESTORED TO ACTIVE STATUS FOR THE FOLLOWING ADMINISTRATIVE REASON{S}: RESTORED TO ENTER DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 21.00 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # MAL047230002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 1352.34 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER CASE NUMBER 98V00655 ARE PLACED INTO THE CASE FILE UNDER THIS NUMBER. JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 01/29/09 , FOR (NORDSTROM NATIONAL CREDIT BANK) , AGAINST (ROSENGREN, LISA-JAYNE) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 1367.70 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 1352.34 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 20.00 . TOTAL $ 2,740.04 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2009
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: ORIGINAL JUDGMENT. DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER BEYER. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 2740.04. RN MAL472300002 .

    Read MoreRead Less