This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2016 at 02:13:51 (UTC).

NISSAN WOODWORKS, INC. VS. YACOBIAN, STEPHEN

Case Summary

On 10/25/2010 NISSAN WOODWORKS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YACOBIAN, STEPHEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT HARRISON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0740

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT HARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NISSAN WOODWORKS INC. DBA KITCHEN CABINET CENTER

Defendant

YACOBIAN STEPHEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. ROBERT HARRISON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 01/14/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1101028E3873. HEARING SET FOR 12/16/10 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION ELECTRONICALLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NISSAN WOODWORKS LLC is a litigant