This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2016 at 04:36:26 (UTC).

NIJJAR, PETE VS. ROLON, JUAN

Case Summary

On 10/23/2009 NIJJAR, PETE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROLON, JUAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1113

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NIJJAR PETE

Defendants

MARQUEZ MARIA

ROLON JUAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS,COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ROLON, JUAN) . COSTS OF $ .00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS,COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MARQUEZ, MARIA) . COSTS OF $ .00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ROLON, JUAN) , (MARQUEZ, MARIA) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 11/03/09 . FOR (NIJJAR, PETE) . AGAINST (ROLON, JUAN) , (MARQUEZ, MARIA) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 11129 MILDRED ST #38 EL MONTE, CA 91731 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 27.50 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. EL MONTE SHERIFFS DEPT (MS) . RECEIPT # ELM511049037 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM478900002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less