Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 14:43:24 (UTC).

NAVA, SALVADOR VS. FLORES, EFREN

Case Summary

On 06/01/2009 NAVA, SALVADOR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FLORES, EFREN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0745

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Huntington Park Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVA SALVADOR

Defendant

FLORES EFREN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 09/02/10 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 26.66 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # HPK542830003 . *OVER COUNTER*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/16/09 , FOR (NAVA, SALVADOR) , AGAINST (FLORES, EFREN) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 9610 SAN ANTONIO AVE APT B, SOUTH GATE, CA 90280 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (FLORES, EFREN) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (NAVA, SALVADOR) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST TO DEFAULT ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS:// REQUEST IS PREMATURE. SUBMITTED ON 06/10/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (FLORES, EFREN) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RECEIPT # HPK542830002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 07/16/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less