This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2016 at 02:27:41 (UTC).

NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC. VS AMMERMAN, KELLY K.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMMERMAN, KELLY K. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0876

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC.

Defendant

AMMERMAN KELLY K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCALIA, JOSEPH W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2015
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $8906.61

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $346.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • AMENDED ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION FOR A MEMORANDUM OF COSTS +

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT REJECTED. +

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT REJECTED. +

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ASSIGNEE OF RECORD +

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2009
  • OSC VACATED - RESPONSIVE PLEADING FILED; CASE SET FOR CMR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • DECLARATION OF MAILING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2009
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2009
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2009
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED+

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • CMR SET 02/23/09, 0830 AM, DEPT. 108, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.