This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 11:44:43 (UTC).

MYERS INVESTMENT COMPANY VS. MAKHSHIKYAN, PETROS

Case Summary

On 04/23/2009 MYERS INVESTMENT COMPANY filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against MAKHSHIKYAN, PETROS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0393

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MYERS INVESTMENT COMPANY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

MAKHSHIKYAN PETROS AN INDIVIDUAL DOING BUSINESS AS FRAMES BY PETROS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOWER & ASSOCIATES - LESLIE A. BOWER

Attorney at BOWER & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO FINAL DISPOSITION . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/07/09 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER;PREJUDGMENT CLAIM CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MAKHSHIKYAN, PETROS), AN INDIVIDUAL DOING BUSINESS AS (FRAMES BY PETROS) . COSTS OF $ 52.90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER;PREJUDGMENT CLAIM CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM FILED. SERVED AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS . COSTS OF $ 30.57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • ORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION AND ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING FOR (MAKHSHIKYAN, PETROS), AN INDIVIDUAL DOING BUSINESS AS (FRAMES BY PETROS) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 001 FOR CONSIDERATION. RECEIPT # ELM236112015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2009
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) RETURNED AS TO (MAKHSHIKYAN, PETROS), AN INDIVIDUAL DOING BUSINESS AS (FRAMES BY PETROS) DUE TO ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) RETURNED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS DUE TO INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM236112012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less