This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2016 at 07:01:15 (UTC).

MURAT, KANBAY VS AURUM ADVISORS CORP.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2011 MURAT, KANBAY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AURUM ADVISORS CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL J. HALLOWITZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1214

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CAROL J. HALLOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURAT KANBAY

Defendant

AURUM ADVISORS CORP.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE INGLEWOOD COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM LAW11W01214 TO ING11SX1214

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • SUPPLEMENTAL ON WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED AS FOLLOWS: $ 25.00 APPLIED TO COST OF WRIT AND TO ACCRUED INTEREST {LINES 16 & 17}. $ 24.20 APPLIED TO COLLECTION OF DAILY INTEREST {LINE 19}. $ 1998.73 APPLIED TO THE JUDGMENT {LINE 15}.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (MURAT, KANBAY) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (MURAT, KANBAY) IS GRANTED BY OPERATION OF LAW.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE ON WAIVED FEES AND COSTS FILED AND MAILED TO (AURUM ADVISORS CORP.) PURSUANT TO SECTION 68637 G.C. FOR THE TOTAL AMOUNT OF $ 60.00 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COMPLETED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (AURUM ADVISORS CORP.) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. CAROL J. HALLOWITZ, COMM'R PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED 2ND REQUEST, GRANTED IN DEPT. 92 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • AMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF (MURAT, KANBAY) FILED AMENDING AMOUNT ,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 02/10/12 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (AURUM ADVISORS CORP.) . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 2.50 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED 1ST REQUEST (IN PERSON) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 12/05/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER . HEARING SET FOR 09/30/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (MURAT, KANBAY) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (MURAT, KANBAY) IS GRANTED BY OPERATION OF LAW.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less