This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2016 at 08:32:16 (UTC).

MUNGCHI, INC VS. OSCAR CARABELLO AS TRUSTEE OF

Case Summary

On 02/18/2011 MUNGCHI, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OSCAR CARABELLO AS TRUSTEE OF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT HARRISON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1633

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT HARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUNGCHI INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

OSCAR CARABELLO AS TRUSTEE OF CARABELLO FAMILY TRUST

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: NOTICE OF RULING RETURNED AS TO (MUNGCHI, INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DUE TO NOT KNOWN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. ROBERT HARRISON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: PLANTIFFS CLAIM RETURNED AS TO (OSCAR CARABELLO AS TRUSTEE OF CARABELLO FAMILY TRUST) DUE TO NOT KNOWN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 05/31/11 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED LESS THAN 10 DAYS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAC277592007 . HEARING SET FOR 03/30/11 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mungchi Inc is a litigant