This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2016 at 10:34:29 (UTC).

MOINI, LEYLI VS. WELLMAN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, I

Case Summary

On 06/24/2010 MOINI, LEYLI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WELLMAN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, I. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY COWAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1647

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JEFFREY COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOINI LEYLI

Defendant

WELLMAN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/28/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. WEQ , HON. JEFFREY COWAN, PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: REQUEST TO AMEND PARTY NAME BEFORE HEARING (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED. SERVED AS TO (WELLMAN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC.) . COSTS OF $ 41.90 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • REQUEST TO AMEND PARTY NAME BEFORE HEARING FILED BY (MOINI, LEYLI) . CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER CHANGED TO AMEND PARTIES' NAME(S) AS FOLLOWS: PACIFIC BAY TOWERS HOME OWNERS' ASSOCATION FOR 2025-2035-2045

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN SM510933004. HEARING SET FOR 07/28/10 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. WEQ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLMAN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant