This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 05:24:31 (UTC).

MODERN YARD, INC. VS. WYNN, BRIAN

Case Summary

On 10/07/2011 MODERN YARD, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WYNN, BRIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLIE E. BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3667

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LESLIE E. BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MODERN YARD INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

WYNN BRIANAN INDIVIDUAL

WYNN TINAAN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINSTON *& STRAWN LLP - ERIN R RANAHAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 05/06/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 11C03667 TO LAM11CB3667

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON04/05/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TOALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN BH451225020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TODEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE LESLIE E. BROWN .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DocketNON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR02/06/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 . CLERK`SCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVEPARTIES/COUNSEL ON 10/07/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less