This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2016 at 13:48:38 (UTC).

M&O HOLDINGS LLC VS MONTUFAR, CARLOS

Case Summary

On 07/22/2011 M O HOLDINGS LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against MONTUFAR, CARLOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9609

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&O HOLDINGS LLC

Defendant

MONTUFAR CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELLER & FLOYD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2011
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2011
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; RETURNED VIA ATTY SER/OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • JUDGMENT AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR UNNAMED TENANTS FILED (DEFAULT NOT REQUESTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2011
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2011
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2011
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M&O HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant