This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2018 at 10:23:16 (UTC).

MIRZA, ZAKIR VS HULL, DAVID

Case Summary

On 03/04/2009 MIRZA, ZAKIR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HULL, DAVID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0250

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRZA ZAKIR

Defendant

HULL DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REAL, VINCENT

REAL VINCENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2009
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 215.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REAL, VINCENT