This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 04:32:30 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. SALDANA, RAFAEL T

Case Summary

On 01/30/2009 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SALDANA, RAFAEL T. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LYNN D. OLSON and LIA R. MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0257

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

Presiding Judge

LIA R. MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ASSIGNEE OF HOUSEHOLD FINANCE

Defendant

SALDANA RAFAEL T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP, P.C. - ERICA L. BRACHFELD

Attorney at THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP, P.C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) ASSIGNEE OF (HOUSEHOLD FINANCE) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL- PLAINTIFF FILED A DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION ON 9/14/2009 SUBMITTED ON 09/24/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. COMM. LIA R. MARTIN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: IN-CHAMBERS REVIEW . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: SANCTIONS ORDERED 08/13/09 AGAINST THE PLAINTIFF ARE VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 001 FOR CONSIDERATION UNPAID SANCTIONS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 10/01/09 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN ELM236112007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/13/09 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less