This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/11/2021 at 03:59:32 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. VS HYUN, BYUNG GUN

Case Summary

On 02/11/2009 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HYUN, BYUNG GUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0159

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC.

Defendant

HYUN BYUNG GUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MUREN, TARA

MUREN TARA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Case Destroyed pursuant to California Government Code Section 68151 and 68153.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAC COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0999.37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2009
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT. REQUEST FOR DEFAULT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • DocketOSC CONTINUED TO 02/08/10, 0830 AM, DEPT. 87 RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE Filing Fee: 200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • DocketOSC SET 08/17/09, 0830 AM, DEPT. 87, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tara Muren